Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0284 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023