|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-215
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 119, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/15/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/08/23, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/21/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/08/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|