|
05/18/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-91
|
|
|
|
05/17/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 03/21/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|