Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1537 (Ch. 2023-39) | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Filed |