Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 267 (Ch. 2023-63)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted HB 267
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Banking and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/20/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|