Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0312 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023