Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/21/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/20/2023 | Filed |