Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 30, 2023