Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Filed |