Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Filed |