Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023