Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Filed |