Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 49 (Ch. 2023-142)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 49
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|