Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Filed |