Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 737 (Ch. 2023-127)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 737
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|