Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0452 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023