Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Filed |