Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0464 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023