Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/12/23, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Filed |