Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 233 (Ch. 2023-109)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 233
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Criminal Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|