Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 133 (Ch. 2023-181)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 133
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/07/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|