Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023