Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Filed |