Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 441 (Ch. 2023-124)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted HB 441
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|