Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 537 (Ch. 2023-146)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 537
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|