Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 401 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Filed |