Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1087 (Ch. 2023-152)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted HB 1087
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|