Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 339 (Ch. 2023-279) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed |