House | 05/05/2023 | Died in Messages | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | In Messages | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Now in Regulated Industries | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed |