Senate | 05/02/2023 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 825 (Ch. 2023-128) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Substituted HB 825 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/20/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Now in Health Policy | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Health Policy; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Filed |