Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0600 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023