Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 599 (Ch. 2023-206)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 599
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|