Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | CS by Transportation read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | CS by Transportation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/27/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed |