Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023