Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0664 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 7, 2023