Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Filed |