|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-220
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (955767)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 955767 engrossed amendment (replaces 947129, 797383)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 947129 adopted as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 797383 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|