|
05/25/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-116
|
|
|
|
05/24/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 119, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/30/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Transportation; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|