Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | CS by Judiciary read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Remaining references corrected to Rules | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Original reference(s) removed: Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/23, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed |