Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0696 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023