Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/18/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Filed |