Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Now in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Commerce and Tourism; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Filed |