House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/23, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/18/23, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|