Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0742 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023