Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Favorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Filed |