Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0768 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 26, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023