Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0770 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023