|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-49
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 37
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (372388)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/30/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/14/23, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Ethics and Elections; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|