Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Filed |