Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 485 (Ch. 2023-162)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 485
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 04/12/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 03/29/23, 12:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|